Senate | 06/01/2022 | Referred to Com. on E.Q. | ||
Senate | 05/24/2022 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2022 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 18. Page 4884.) | ||
Assembly | 05/19/2022 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/19/2022 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 19). | ||
Assembly | 05/11/2022 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/26/2022 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/19/2022 | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | ||
Assembly | 04/18/2022 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 04/18/2022 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/13/2022 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 03/17/2022 | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | ||
Assembly | 02/16/2022 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. | ||
Assembly | 02/15/2022 | Introduced. To print. |