California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2154 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2022

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2022

Chaptered

Bill September 18, 2022

Amended

Bill June 13, 2022
Bill March 14, 2022