|
09/13/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 279, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2022
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 4979.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2022
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2022
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2022
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 0. Page 4579.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2022
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2022
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|