Assembly | 02/01/2022 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2022 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 01/11/2022 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 03/23/2021 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 01/28/2021 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 01/12/2021 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 11. | ||
Assembly | 01/11/2021 | Read first time. To print. |