California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2160 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2022

Enrolled

Bill August 24, 2022

Chaptered

Bill September 13, 2022

Amended

Bill May 5, 2022
Bill March 29, 2022