09/02/2022 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 234, Statutes of 2022. | |||
09/02/2022 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
08/23/2022 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |||
Assembly | 08/18/2022 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/17/2022 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4870.). | ||
Senate | 06/21/2022 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/20/2022 | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | ||
Senate | 06/01/2022 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 05/18/2022 | Referred to Com. on E.Q. | ||
Senate | 05/10/2022 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2022 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 67. Noes 0. Page 4606.) | ||
Assembly | 04/27/2022 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 27). | ||
Assembly | 03/23/2022 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 02/24/2022 | Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. | ||
Assembly | 02/16/2022 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. | ||
Assembly | 02/15/2022 | Introduced. To print. |