07/19/2022 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 121, Statutes of 2022. | |||
07/19/2022 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
07/11/2022 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m. | |||
Assembly | 06/27/2022 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 06/27/2022 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4434.). | ||
Senate | 06/16/2022 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/15/2022 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 14). | ||
Senate | 05/11/2022 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Senate | 05/03/2022 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/02/2022 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 4506.) | ||
Assembly | 04/07/2022 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 04/06/2022 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 6). | ||
Assembly | 02/24/2022 | Referred to Com. on A. & A.R. | ||
Assembly | 02/16/2022 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. | ||
Assembly | 02/15/2022 | Read first time. To print. |