California 2021 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2176 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 06/10/2022

                    Enrolled  June 10, 2022 Passed IN  Senate  June 09, 2022 Passed IN  Assembly  April 18, 2022 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Bill No. 2176Introduced by Assembly Member WoodFebruary 15, 2022 An act to amend Section 102400 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to vital records. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 2176, Wood. Live birth registration. Existing law requires each live birth to be registered with the local registrar of births and deaths for the district in which the birth occurred within 10 days following the date of the event. This bill would instead require each live birth to be registered with the local registrar within 21 days following the date of the event.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY  Appropriation: NO  Fiscal Committee: NO  Local Program: NO Bill TextThe people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 102400 of the Health and Safety Code is amended to read:102400. Each live birth shall be registered with the local registrar of births and deaths for the district in which the birth occurred within 21 days following the date of the event.

 Enrolled  June 10, 2022 Passed IN  Senate  June 09, 2022 Passed IN  Assembly  April 18, 2022 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Bill No. 2176Introduced by Assembly Member WoodFebruary 15, 2022 An act to amend Section 102400 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to vital records. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 2176, Wood. Live birth registration. Existing law requires each live birth to be registered with the local registrar of births and deaths for the district in which the birth occurred within 10 days following the date of the event. This bill would instead require each live birth to be registered with the local registrar within 21 days following the date of the event.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY  Appropriation: NO  Fiscal Committee: NO  Local Program: NO 

 Enrolled  June 10, 2022 Passed IN  Senate  June 09, 2022 Passed IN  Assembly  April 18, 2022

Enrolled  June 10, 2022
Passed IN  Senate  June 09, 2022
Passed IN  Assembly  April 18, 2022

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION

 Assembly Bill 

No. 2176

Introduced by Assembly Member WoodFebruary 15, 2022

Introduced by Assembly Member Wood
February 15, 2022

 An act to amend Section 102400 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to vital records. 

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

AB 2176, Wood. Live birth registration.

 Existing law requires each live birth to be registered with the local registrar of births and deaths for the district in which the birth occurred within 10 days following the date of the event. This bill would instead require each live birth to be registered with the local registrar within 21 days following the date of the event.

 Existing law requires each live birth to be registered with the local registrar of births and deaths for the district in which the birth occurred within 10 days following the date of the event. 

This bill would instead require each live birth to be registered with the local registrar within 21 days following the date of the event.

## Digest Key

## Bill Text

The people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 102400 of the Health and Safety Code is amended to read:102400. Each live birth shall be registered with the local registrar of births and deaths for the district in which the birth occurred within 21 days following the date of the event.

The people of the State of California do enact as follows:

## The people of the State of California do enact as follows:

SECTION 1. Section 102400 of the Health and Safety Code is amended to read:102400. Each live birth shall be registered with the local registrar of births and deaths for the district in which the birth occurred within 21 days following the date of the event.

SECTION 1. Section 102400 of the Health and Safety Code is amended to read:

### SECTION 1.

102400. Each live birth shall be registered with the local registrar of births and deaths for the district in which the birth occurred within 21 days following the date of the event.

102400. Each live birth shall be registered with the local registrar of births and deaths for the district in which the birth occurred within 21 days following the date of the event.

102400. Each live birth shall be registered with the local registrar of births and deaths for the district in which the birth occurred within 21 days following the date of the event.



102400. Each live birth shall be registered with the local registrar of births and deaths for the district in which the birth occurred within 21 days following the date of the event.