California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2176 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-Assembly Bill No. 2176 CHAPTER 34 An act to amend Section 102400 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to vital records. [ Approved by Governor June 21, 2022. Filed with Secretary of State June 21, 2022. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 2176, Wood. Live birth registration. Existing law requires each live birth to be registered with the local registrar of births and deaths for the district in which the birth occurred within 10 days following the date of the event. This bill would instead require each live birth to be registered with the local registrar within 21 days following the date of the event.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY Appropriation: NO Fiscal Committee: NO Local Program: NO Bill TextThe people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 102400 of the Health and Safety Code is amended to read:102400. Each live birth shall be registered with the local registrar of births and deaths for the district in which the birth occurred within 21 days following the date of the event.
1+Enrolled June 10, 2022 Passed IN Senate June 09, 2022 Passed IN Assembly April 18, 2022 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Bill No. 2176Introduced by Assembly Member WoodFebruary 15, 2022 An act to amend Section 102400 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to vital records. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 2176, Wood. Live birth registration. Existing law requires each live birth to be registered with the local registrar of births and deaths for the district in which the birth occurred within 10 days following the date of the event. This bill would instead require each live birth to be registered with the local registrar within 21 days following the date of the event.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY Appropriation: NO Fiscal Committee: NO Local Program: NO Bill TextThe people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 102400 of the Health and Safety Code is amended to read:102400. Each live birth shall be registered with the local registrar of births and deaths for the district in which the birth occurred within 21 days following the date of the event.
22
3- Assembly Bill No. 2176 CHAPTER 34 An act to amend Section 102400 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to vital records. [ Approved by Governor June 21, 2022. Filed with Secretary of State June 21, 2022. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 2176, Wood. Live birth registration. Existing law requires each live birth to be registered with the local registrar of births and deaths for the district in which the birth occurred within 10 days following the date of the event. This bill would instead require each live birth to be registered with the local registrar within 21 days following the date of the event.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY Appropriation: NO Fiscal Committee: NO Local Program: NO
3+ Enrolled June 10, 2022 Passed IN Senate June 09, 2022 Passed IN Assembly April 18, 2022 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Bill No. 2176Introduced by Assembly Member WoodFebruary 15, 2022 An act to amend Section 102400 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to vital records. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 2176, Wood. Live birth registration. Existing law requires each live birth to be registered with the local registrar of births and deaths for the district in which the birth occurred within 10 days following the date of the event. This bill would instead require each live birth to be registered with the local registrar within 21 days following the date of the event.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY Appropriation: NO Fiscal Committee: NO Local Program: NO
44
5- Assembly Bill No. 2176 CHAPTER 34
5+ Enrolled June 10, 2022 Passed IN Senate June 09, 2022 Passed IN Assembly April 18, 2022
66
7- Assembly Bill No. 2176
7+Enrolled June 10, 2022
8+Passed IN Senate June 09, 2022
9+Passed IN Assembly April 18, 2022
810
9- CHAPTER 34
11+ CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION
12+
13+ Assembly Bill
14+
15+No. 2176
16+
17+Introduced by Assembly Member WoodFebruary 15, 2022
18+
19+Introduced by Assembly Member Wood
20+February 15, 2022
1021
1122 An act to amend Section 102400 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to vital records.
12-
13- [ Approved by Governor June 21, 2022. Filed with Secretary of State June 21, 2022. ]
1423
1524 LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST
1625
1726 ## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST
1827
1928 AB 2176, Wood. Live birth registration.
2029
2130 Existing law requires each live birth to be registered with the local registrar of births and deaths for the district in which the birth occurred within 10 days following the date of the event. This bill would instead require each live birth to be registered with the local registrar within 21 days following the date of the event.
2231
2332 Existing law requires each live birth to be registered with the local registrar of births and deaths for the district in which the birth occurred within 10 days following the date of the event.
2433
2534 This bill would instead require each live birth to be registered with the local registrar within 21 days following the date of the event.
2635
2736 ## Digest Key
2837
2938 ## Bill Text
3039
3140 The people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 102400 of the Health and Safety Code is amended to read:102400. Each live birth shall be registered with the local registrar of births and deaths for the district in which the birth occurred within 21 days following the date of the event.
3241
3342 The people of the State of California do enact as follows:
3443
3544 ## The people of the State of California do enact as follows:
3645
3746 SECTION 1. Section 102400 of the Health and Safety Code is amended to read:102400. Each live birth shall be registered with the local registrar of births and deaths for the district in which the birth occurred within 21 days following the date of the event.
3847
3948 SECTION 1. Section 102400 of the Health and Safety Code is amended to read:
4049
4150 ### SECTION 1.
4251
4352 102400. Each live birth shall be registered with the local registrar of births and deaths for the district in which the birth occurred within 21 days following the date of the event.
4453
4554 102400. Each live birth shall be registered with the local registrar of births and deaths for the district in which the birth occurred within 21 days following the date of the event.
4655
4756 102400. Each live birth shall be registered with the local registrar of births and deaths for the district in which the birth occurred within 21 days following the date of the event.
4857
4958
5059
5160 102400. Each live birth shall be registered with the local registrar of births and deaths for the district in which the birth occurred within 21 days following the date of the event.