Assembly | 05/19/2022 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 04/27/2022 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 03/28/2022 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 03/24/2022 | Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/23/2022 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 21). | ||
Assembly | 03/15/2022 | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | ||
Assembly | 03/14/2022 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 02/24/2022 | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | ||
Assembly | 02/16/2022 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. | ||
Assembly | 02/15/2022 | Read first time. To print. |