|
09/15/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 329, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
09/15/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2022
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 73. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2022
|
Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2022
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 5121.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2022
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2022
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2022
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 0. Page 4658.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 4).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/29/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2022
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2022
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2022
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|