Assembly | 05/19/2022 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 05/11/2022 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 05/03/2022 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (May 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/28/2022 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 04/27/2022 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/31/2022 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (March 30). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 02/24/2022 | Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and JUD. | ||
Assembly | 02/16/2022 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. | ||
Assembly | 02/15/2022 | Read first time. To print. |