|
09/28/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 673, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2022
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 55. Noes 18.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2022
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2022
|
Assembly Rule 63 suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2022
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 31 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 10. Page 5177.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2022
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2022
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2022
|
Referred to Coms. on L., P.E. & R. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 22. Page 4929.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2022
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2022
|
Measure version as amended on March 24 corrected.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2022
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/24/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/24/2022
|
Referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2022
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2022
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|