Assembly | 04/19/2022 | In committee: Hearing for testimony only. | ||
Assembly | 04/05/2022 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. | ||
Assembly | 03/30/2022 | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 03/29/2022 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 02/24/2022 | Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and P. & C.P. | ||
Assembly | 02/16/2022 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. | ||
Assembly | 02/15/2022 | Read first time. To print. |