California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2205 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2022

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2022

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2022

Amended

Bill August 15, 2022
Bill March 24, 2022