California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2206 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2022

Enrolled

Bill September 1, 2022

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2022

Amended

Bill August 22, 2022
Bill June 30, 2022
Bill April 20, 2022