Assembly | 05/19/2022 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 05/19/2022 | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4736.) | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2022 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 05/03/2022 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 05/02/2022 | Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/28/2022 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 27). | ||
Assembly | 02/24/2022 | Referred to Com. on H. & C.D. | ||
Assembly | 02/16/2022 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. | ||
Assembly | 02/15/2022 | Read first time. To print. |