Senate | 06/01/2022 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 05/26/2022 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/25/2022 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4930.) | ||
Assembly | 05/19/2022 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/19/2022 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 19). | ||
Assembly | 05/11/2022 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/26/2022 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/25/2022 | Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/21/2022 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 20). | ||
Assembly | 03/28/2022 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Assembly | 03/24/2022 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 02/16/2022 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. | ||
Assembly | 02/15/2022 | Read first time. To print. |