|
08/29/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 207, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2022
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 61. Noes 6. Page 5812.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2022
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 10 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4679.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/03/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2022
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2022
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2022
|
Referred to Com. on HOUSING.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 59. Noes 7. Page 4834.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (May 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2022
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/29/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2022
|
Referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2022
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2022
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|