LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2021-2022 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2218
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2218
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2021-2022 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2218
Action History
Assembly
03/17/2022
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
Assembly
03/10/2022
Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.
Assembly
03/09/2022
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended.
Assembly
02/24/2022
Referred to Coms. on B. & F. and P. & C.P.
Assembly
02/16/2022
From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
Assembly
02/15/2022
Read first time. To print.