California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2234 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2022

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2022

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2022

Amended

Bill August 18, 2022
Bill August 11, 2022
Bill June 23, 2022
Bill June 8, 2022
Bill May 2, 2022
Bill April 6, 2022
Bill March 29, 2022