|
07/19/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 122, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
07/19/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2022
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4573.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 22).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2022
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5019.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 5).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/24/2022
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2022
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/03/2022
|
Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2022
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2022
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|