California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2248 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2022

Enrolled

Bill September 1, 2022

Amended

Bill August 11, 2022
Bill June 30, 2022
Bill March 24, 2022
Bill March 17, 2022