Senate
|
06/30/2021
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and M. & V.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1779.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2021
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on M. & V.A.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on M. & V.A. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on M. & V.A. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on M. & V.A.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/28/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and M. & V.A.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/12/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 11.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/11/2021
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|