Assembly | 05/19/2022 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 05/04/2022 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/20/2022 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/19/2022 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 04/18/2022 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/24/2022 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2022 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. | ||
Assembly | 02/16/2022 | Read first time. To print. |