California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2251 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2022

Enrolled

Bill August 16, 2022

Chaptered

Bill August 26, 2022

Amended

Bill June 21, 2022
Bill May 19, 2022
Bill April 18, 2022
Bill March 21, 2022