|
09/29/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 779, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2022
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2022
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 20 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4900.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2022
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2022
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 31).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2022
|
Referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 4371.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/24/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (March 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/14/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on C. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/10/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on C. & C. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/10/2022
|
Referred to Com. on C. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2022
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2022
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|