Assembly | 04/25/2022 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 04/25/2022 | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. | ||
Assembly | 04/21/2022 | Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/20/2022 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 20). | ||
Assembly | 04/18/2022 | (pending re-refer to Com. on B. & F.) | ||
Assembly | 04/18/2022 | Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 4251.) | ||
Assembly | 03/31/2022 | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | ||
Assembly | 03/30/2022 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/03/2022 | Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and B. & F. | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2022 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. | ||
Assembly | 02/16/2022 | Read first time. To print. |