California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2260 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2022

Enrolled

Bill August 24, 2022

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2022

Amended

Bill June 21, 2022
Bill June 13, 2022
Bill April 7, 2022