LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2021-2022 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2263
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2263
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2021-2022 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2263
Action History
Assembly
05/19/2022
In committee: Held under submission.
Assembly
05/04/2022
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
Assembly
04/20/2022
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Assembly
03/03/2022
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
Assembly
02/17/2022
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
Assembly
02/16/2022
Read first time. To print.