Assembly | 05/19/2022 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 04/27/2022 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/07/2022 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/06/2022 | Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/05/2022 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (April 5). | ||
Assembly | 03/31/2022 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 03/29/2022 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 29). | ||
Assembly | 03/03/2022 | Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and JUD. | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2022 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. | ||
Assembly | 02/16/2022 | Read first time. To print. |