|
09/23/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 497, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
09/23/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2022
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4872.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2022
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2022
|
From Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2022
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2022
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 4371.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/22/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (March 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2022
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2022
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|