|
09/28/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 693, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2022
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4908.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2022
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2022
|
Referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4837.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2022
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/03/2022
|
Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2022
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2022
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|