|
08/26/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 187, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2022
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4681.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2022
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2022
|
6-23-2022 hearing rescheduled by committee to 6-22-2022.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2022
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4839.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2022
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/22/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/03/2022
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2022
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2022
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|