|
06/20/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 21, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/09/2022
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4130.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 31).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2022
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 4469.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/24/2022
|
Measure version as amended on March 17 corrected.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/22/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/03/2022
|
Referred to Coms. on JUD. and HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2022
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2022
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|