California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB229 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 12, 2021

Enrolled

Bill September 10, 2021

Chaptered

Bill October 8, 2021

Amended

Bill September 2, 2021
Bill August 16, 2021
Bill July 15, 2021
Bill June 7, 2021
Bill March 2, 2021