|
09/30/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 856, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2022
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 59. Noes 13.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2022
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2022
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 8.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2022
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2022
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2022
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2022
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 15.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (May 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2022
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2022
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2022
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|