California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2295 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2022

Enrolled

Bill September 1, 2022

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2022

Amended

Bill August 25, 2022
Bill August 1, 2022
Bill June 23, 2022
Bill May 2, 2022
Bill April 21, 2022
Bill March 29, 2022