California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2298 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2022

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2022

Chaptered

Bill September 22, 2022

Amended

Bill August 25, 2022
Bill June 28, 2022