Senate | 06/21/2022 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Testimony taken. | ||
Senate | 06/08/2022 | Referred to Com. on HOUSING. | ||
Senate | 05/26/2022 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/25/2022 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4989.) | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2022 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/19/2022 | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/19/2022 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 19). | ||
Assembly | 05/11/2022 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/21/2022 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/21/2022 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 03/23/2022 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 03/03/2022 | Referred to Com. on H. & C.D. | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2022 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. | ||
Assembly | 02/16/2022 | Read first time. To print. |