|
09/29/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 780, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2022
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2022
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2022
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2022
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2022
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2022
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HUMAN S. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2022
|
Referred to Coms. on JUD. and HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 4840.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2022
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/22/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/15/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/14/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/03/2022
|
Referred to Coms. on JUD. and HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2022
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2022
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|