California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2320 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2022

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2022

Amended

Bill August 11, 2022
Bill June 21, 2022
Bill June 8, 2022
Bill April 18, 2022