Senate
|
08/26/2021
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/05/2021
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2021
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 1. Page 1751.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2021
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/25/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/28/2021
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/13/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 12.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/12/2021
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|