|
10/09/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 740, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2021
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 8. Page 2220.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2021
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/07/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (July 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on L., P.E. & R. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/17/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 62. Noes 9. Page 1433.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (April 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2021
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/02/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/01/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E. & R. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/28/2021
|
Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/14/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 13.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/13/2021
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|