|
07/01/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 84, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2022
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 71. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/16/2022
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 18 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4265.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 8).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2022
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 4048.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/22/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 22).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2022
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2022
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|