California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2402 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2022

Amended

Bill August 18, 2022
Bill August 11, 2022
Bill June 27, 2022
Bill March 17, 2022