Senate
|
08/11/2022
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2022
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2022
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2022
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 4740.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/14/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/10/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/10/2022
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2022
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2022
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|