|
09/30/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 913, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2022
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 63. Noes 4.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2022
|
Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2022
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 9. Page 5051.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/10/2022
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 8).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2022
|
Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 3. Page 4818.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (April 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/30/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (March 30). Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/03/2022
|
Referred to Coms. on P.E. & R. and HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2022
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2022
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|