LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2021-2022 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2430
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2430
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2021-2022 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2430
Action History
Assembly
04/20/2022
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Assembly
04/07/2022
Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
Assembly
04/06/2022
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
Assembly
03/24/2022
Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV.
Assembly
02/18/2022
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
Assembly
02/17/2022
Read first time. To print.