Assembly
|
09/29/2022
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2022
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 54. Noes 16.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2022
|
Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2022
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 9. Page 5074.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2022
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2022
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2022
|
Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 18. Page 4366.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/30/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (March 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2022
|
Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2022
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2022
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|